WA HB1515 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning contracting and procurement requirements for behavioral health services in medical assistance programs.
Title
Concerning contracting and procurement requirements for behavioral health services in medical assistance programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Health & Long Term Care (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Health & Long Term Care (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-04 | House | Chapter 292, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-19 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-13 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2023-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-02 | House | Floor amendment |
2023-03-02 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-24 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-02-14 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-14 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-14 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |