WA HB1513 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Effective date 7/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Effective date 7/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the collection of youth voter registration sign up information.
Title
Concerning the collection of youth voter registration sign up information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | House | Effective date 7/1/2019. |
2018-03-19 | House | Chapter 109, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | And refer to Transportation. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 6:00 PM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 46; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | SEIT - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | SGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government. |
2017-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 45; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-03-01 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-22 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2017-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-07 | House | SEIT - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |