WA HB1500 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning regular financial audits of school districts.
Title
Concerning regular financial audits of school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-18 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-05 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |