WA HB1489 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-17 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-17 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating Mount St. Helens special license plates.
Title
Creating Mount St. Helens special license plates.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-02 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2024-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-02 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-02 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5590 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
46 | 17 | 220 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 18 | 200 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 68 | 420 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |