WA HB1480 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Streamlining the permitting process for disposing of dredged materials.
Title
Streamlining the permitting process for disposing of dredged materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-30 | House | Chapter 225, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2019-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-19 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |