WA HB1474 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Effective date 7/23/2023*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Effective date 7/23/2023*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the covenant homeownership account and program to address the history of housing discrimination due to racially restrictive real estate covenants in Washington state.
Title
Creating the covenant homeownership account and program to address the history of housing discrimination due to racially restrictive real estate covenants in Washington state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Committee on Housing: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Committee on Housing: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023*. |
2023-05-08 | House | Chapter 340, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-20 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-17 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 52; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-04-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:45 PM. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | HSG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing. |
2023-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-02 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-24 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-02-09 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-09 | House | HOUS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Housing. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5496 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 18 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
43 | 84 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |