WA HB1470 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying declaration of candidacy provisions.
Title
Modifying declaration of candidacy provisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Matt Manweller [R] |
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | SEIT - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government. |
2017-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-07 | House | SEIT - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB5337 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.