WA HB1464 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the development of cooperative agreements to expand recreational access on privately owned lands.
Title
Concerning the development of cooperative agreements to expand recreational access on privately owned lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-08 | House | Chapter 245, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-21 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-19 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-17 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | NRP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |
2017-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-27 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-14 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-09 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-09 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB5384 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.