WA HB1460 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Civil Rights & Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Civil Rights & Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning notice requirements for rent increases.
Title
Concerning notice requirements for rent increases.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. William Jenkin [R] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] |
Rep. Drew Stokesbary [R] | Rep. Larry Hoff [R] | Sen. Chris Gildon [R] | Rep. Kelly Chambers [R] |
Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Mary Dye [R] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Mike Volz [R] |
Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1460&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1460.pdf |