WA HB1460 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding critical access hospitals not subject to certificate of need review.
Title
Regarding critical access hospitals not subject to certificate of need review.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-10 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. | |
2009-03-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-06 | Floor amendment | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-19 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-19 | HCW - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-12 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-21 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5423 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-10 - Effective date 7/26/2009.