WA HB1452 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the opportunity scholarship program.
Title
Concerning the opportunity scholarship program.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Holy [R] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Luanne Van Werven [R] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] |
Rep. Melanie Stambaugh [R] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-21 | House | Chapter 114, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-05 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 12:00 PM. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Returned to House Rules 3. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-04-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-07 | House | 1st substitute bill not substituted. |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-23 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-23 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-15 | House | HE - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
SB5361 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.