WA HB1446 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Civil Rights & Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Civil Rights & Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing mediation under the residential landlord-tenant act.
Title
Addressing mediation under the residential landlord-tenant act.
Sponsors
Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Sen. June Robinson [D] | Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] |
Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1446&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1446.pdf |