WA HB1437 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Postsecondary Education & Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Postsecondary Education & Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the interstate massage compact.
Title
Concerning the interstate massage compact.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-01-31 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | New Code | See Bill Text |