WA HB1428 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the field of dreams program.
Title
Establishing the field of dreams program.
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Rep. Troy Kelley [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] |
Rep. Daniel Newhouse [R] | Rep. Deb Wallace [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-06 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-21 | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1428&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1428.pdf |