WA HB1426 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying minimum continuing education requirements for administrator and teacher certificate renewals that focus on equity-based school and classroom practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specifying minimum continuing education requirements for administrator and teacher certificate renewals that focus on equity-based school and classroom practices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16HouseEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-04-16HouseChapter 77, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-16HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-13HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-09SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-04-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-23SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-22SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-22SenateEDU - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-04SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2021-03-01HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 74; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-03-01HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-01HouseFloor amendment
2021-03-01House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-15HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-15HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-15HouseED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-12HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-29HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28a410New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1426&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1426.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1426-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1426-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1426-S.SL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1426-S.PL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1426-S%20AMH%20SANT%20WARG%20491.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1426%20HBA%20ED%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1426%20HBR%20ED%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1426-S.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1426-S.E%20SBA%20EDU%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1426-S.E%20SBR%20EDU%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1426-S.E%20SBR%20EDU%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1426-S.E%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1426-S.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124162&actionText=ED%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28638&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124162&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-01-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1426&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124162&actionText=EDU%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28874&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124162&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-05-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1426&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback