WA HB1425 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-22 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-22 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the higher education coordinating board's responsibilities with regard to health sciences and services authorities.
Title
Concerning the higher education coordinating board's responsibilities with regard to health sciences and services authorities.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Haler [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-22 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-04-22 | Chapter 155, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-04-22 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-18 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-18 | President signed. | |
2011-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-22 | Placed on second reading consent calendar. | |
2011-03-21 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-21 | HEWD - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-18 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-11 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-01 | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. | |
2011-02-25 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-02-25 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-22 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. | |
2011-02-11 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-07 | HE - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-07 | HE - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-07 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-26 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-20 | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5484 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.