WA HB1417 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning evaluating military training and experience toward meeting licensing requirements in medical professions.
Title
Concerning evaluating military training and experience toward meeting licensing requirements in medical professions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2012-01-12 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-17 | APPH - Majority; do pass HCW 11 bill proposed by Health Care & Wellness. | |
2011-02-17 | APPH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-17 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Health & Human Services Appropriations & Oversight at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Health & Human Services Appropriations & Oversight. | |
2011-02-10 | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-10 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-10 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-31 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-20 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5307 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-13 - Effective date 7/22/2011.