WA SB5307 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning evaluating military training and experience toward meeting licensing requirements in medical professions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning evaluating military training and experience toward meeting licensing requirements in medical professions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-13 Effective date 7/22/2011.
2011-04-13 Chapter 32, 2011 Laws.
2011-04-13 Governor signed.
2011-04-07 Delivered to Governor.
2011-04-06 Speaker signed.
2011-04-04 President signed.
2011-04-01 Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2011-04-01 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2011-03-23 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2011-03-21 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2011-03-16 HCW - Majority; do pass.
2011-03-16 HCW - Executive action taken by committee.
2011-03-16 Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 9:00 AM.
2011-03-09 Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2011-03-01 First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2011-02-28 Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2011-02-28 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2011-02-28 Floor amendment
2011-02-28 1st substitute bill substituted
2011-02-01 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2011-01-28 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2011-01-28 HEA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2011-01-27 Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2011-01-24 Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2011-01-20 First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care.

Same As/Similar To

HB1417 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback