WA HB1412 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Civil Rights & Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Civil Rights & Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing foreign ownership of agricultural lands.
Title
Addressing foreign ownership of agricultural lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-17 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. |
2023-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |