WA HB1409 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Ecology and Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Ecology and Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an emergency response system for the Strait of Juan de Fuca.
Title
Providing an emergency response system for the Strait of Juan de Fuca.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Ecology & Parks. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-07 | First reading, referred to Environment, Water & Energy. | |
2009-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 62; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-05 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-05 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-20 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-20 | EPAR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-20 | EPAR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-20 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ecology & Parks at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-27 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ecology & Parks at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-20 | First reading, referred to Ecology & Parks. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5344 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-24 - Effective date 7/26/2009.