WA HB1408 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the written consent requirement for survivorship benefit options.
Title
Clarifying the written consent requirement for survivorship benefit options.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-23 | House | Chapter 102, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-17 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-20 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5661 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.