WA HB1406 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Effective date 10/19/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Effective date 10/19/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusting the surface mining funding structure.
Title
Adjusting the surface mining funding structure.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] |
Rep. James Wilcox [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | Effective date 10/19/2017. |
2017-07-07 | House | Chapter 27, 2017 Laws 3rd Special Session. |
2017-07-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-03 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Held at the Desk. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | First Reading. |
2017-06-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-21 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-07 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |