WA HB1401 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expediting professional licenses for new Washington residents.
Title
Expediting professional licenses for new Washington residents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |