WA HB1401 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning data reporting concerning the collection of data when a psychiatric patient meets detention criteria and no evaluation and treatment bed is available.
Title
Concerning data reporting concerning the collection of data when a psychiatric patient meets detention criteria and no evaluation and treatment bed is available.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Michelle Caldier [R] |
Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
Same As/Similar To
SB5645 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1401&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1401.pdf |