WA HB1399 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Native American scholarship program.
Title
Establishing a Native American scholarship program.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Sen. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. Jamila Taylor [D] | Rep. Tarra Simmons [D] |
Rep. Liz Berry [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Mary Fosse [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] |
Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-03 - House - House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-02-07 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2023-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-03 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-03 | House | PEW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-01 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28b | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
28b | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 79a | 040 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |