WA HB1396 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning persons sentenced for aggravated first degree murder committed prior to reaching 21 years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning persons sentenced for aggravated first degree murder committed prior to reaching 21 years of age.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-20HouseHouse Rules "X" file.
2024-01-31HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2024-01-29HouseMinority; do not pass.
2024-01-29HouseCSJR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2024-01-29HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 1:30 PM.
2024-01-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 1:30 PM.
2024-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-01-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 4:00 PM.
2023-01-23HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-18HouseFirst reading, referred to Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1095New CodeSee Bill Text
1095030Amended CodeSee Bill Text
994a510Amended CodeSee Bill Text
994a540Amended CodeSee Bill Text
994a6332Amended CodeSee Bill Text
994a729Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1396&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1396.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1396-S.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1396%20HBA%20CSJR%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=65801
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=66017
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1396%20HBA%20CSJR%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1396%20HBR%20CSJR%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=70352
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=70526
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=71054
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128039&actionText=CSJR%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=31814&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback