WA HB1394 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning community facilities needed to ensure a continuum of care for behavioral health patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning community facilities needed to ensure a continuum of care for behavioral health patients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HouseEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-09HouseChapter 324, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-09HouseGovernor signed.
2019-04-26HouseDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-23HousePassed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-23HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2019-04-17SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-17SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-17SenateCommittee amendment
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-04-09SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-25SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-03-22SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-03-22SenateBH - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care.
2019-03-07SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2019-03-05HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-03-05HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-05House2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-04HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-28HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-27HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-08HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-06HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-21HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Same As/Similar To

SB5431 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1394&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1394.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1394-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1394-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1394-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1394-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1394-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118073&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1394&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118073&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-17-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1394&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118073&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-23-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1394&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback