WA HB1392 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the administrative rate the recreation and conservation funding board may retain to administer the grant programs established in chapter 79A.15 RCW.
Title
Concerning the administrative rate the recreation and conservation funding board may retain to administer the grant programs established in chapter 79A.15 RCW.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | House | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-05-07 | House | Chapter 183, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 73; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | NRP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |
2015-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 72; nays, 25; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-10 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-10 | House | CB - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget |
Same As/Similar To
SB5320 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.