WA HB1389 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the scope of state fire service mobilization and ensuring compliance with existing state and federal disaster response policies.
Title
Addressing the scope of state fire service mobilization and ensuring compliance with existing state and federal disaster response policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | House | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-05-07 | House | Chapter 181, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-24 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-23 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | GOS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |
2015-03-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-19 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-01-21 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2015-01-21 | House | PS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-01-21 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
Same As/Similar To
SB5181 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.