WA HB1380 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing background check provisions for gun sales and transfers relating to Initiative Measure No. 594.
Title
Repealing background check provisions for gun sales and transfers relating to Initiative Measure No. 594.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. David Taylor [R] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] |
Rep. Cary Condotta [R] | Rep. Dave Hayes [R] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1380&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1380.pdf |