WA HB1365 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring universal screening and provider payment for autism and developmental delays for children in medicaid programs.
Title
Requiring universal screening and provider payment for autism and developmental delays for children in medicaid programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-03 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-03 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 11:00 AM. |
2015-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
Same As/Similar To
SB5317 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-10 - Effective date 8/27/2015.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1365&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1365.pdf |