WA HB1361 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on April 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-25 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on April 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-25 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding county supervised community options.
Title
Regarding county supervised community options.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-25 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-25 | Chapter 227, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-25 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-20 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-19 | President signed. | |
2009-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-04-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-18 | HSC - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-17 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-05 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2009-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-05 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-02 | HS - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-02 | HS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-02 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-26 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-19 | First reading, referred to Human Services. |