WA HB1330 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the management of services provided by the office of public guardianship.
Title
Concerning the management of services provided by the office of public guardianship.
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] |
Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-08 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1330&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1330.pdf |