WA HB1329 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-25 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning public meeting accessibility and participation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning public meeting accessibility and participation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-25SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2021-04-06SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-25SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-24SenateSGE - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-03-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-02SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government & Elections.
2021-02-26HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2021-02-26HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-26HouseFloor amendment
2021-02-26House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-24HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-15HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-15HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-15HouseLG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 3:30 PM.
2021-02-12HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-29HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-20HouseFirst reading, referred to Local Government.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4230New CodeSee Bill Text
4230010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4230020Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4230030Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4230070Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4230110Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4230900Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1329&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1329.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1329-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1329-S.E.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1329-S%20AMH%20GOEH%20WRIK%20107.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1329-S%20AMH%20WICK%20WRIK%20112.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1329-S.E%20AMS%20SGE%20S2306.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1329%20HBA%20LG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1329%20HBR%20LG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1329-S.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1329-S.E%20SBA%20SGE%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1329-S.E%20SBR%20SGE%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1329-S.E%20SBR%20SGE%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123684&actionText=LG%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28640&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123684&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-26-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1329&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123684&actionText=SGE%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28896&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback