WA HB1324 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-21 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-21 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the requirements of psychological examinations for peace officer certification.
Title
Modifying the requirements of psychological examinations for peace officer certification.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Crouse [R] | Rep. Mark Ericks [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Allister O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Alex Wood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-21 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-21 | Chapter 139, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-20 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-14 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-10 | President signed. | |
2009-04-09 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 2. | |
2009-04-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on second reading consent calendar. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | JUD - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-27 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-25 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-02-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-02-23 | Placed on third reading. | |
2009-02-23 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2009-02-19 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-16 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-11 | PSEP - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-11 | PSEP - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-11 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-27 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-19 | First reading, referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5157 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.