WA HB1322 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the Walla Walla water 2050 plan.
Title
Concerning the Walla Walla water 2050 plan.
Sponsors
Rep. Skyler Rude [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Mark Klicker [R] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] |
Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2023-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-02 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-20 | House | CB - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2023-01-31 | House | AGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5384 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-16 - First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
90 | 90 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
90 | 90 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |