WA HB1318 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning retail sales tax exemptions for certain aircraft maintenance and repair.
Title
Concerning retail sales tax exemptions for certain aircraft maintenance and repair.
Sponsors
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Mike Volz [R] | Rep. Jenny Graham [R] |
Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-11 | House | Chapter 414, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-20 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-04-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2023-03-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-16 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-15 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-02 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5500 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.