WA HB1314 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Environment & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Environment & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reassessing standards for polychlorinated biphenyls in consumer products.
Title
Reassessing standards for polychlorinated biphenyls in consumer products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5369 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Code Citations
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1314&Year=2023&Initiative=false |
Text | https://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1314.pdf |