WA HB1314 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning municipally produced class A biosolids.
Title
Concerning municipally produced class A biosolids.
Sponsors
Rep. Tami Green [D] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] |
Rep. David Upthegrove [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
2013-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-12 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-12 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-12 | House | ENVI - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Environment. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5322 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.