WA HB1314 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Making 2009-11 transportation appropriations.
Title
Making 2009-11 transportation appropriations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Transportation. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-31 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-31 | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-03-31 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-31 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-30 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-19 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5352 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-13 - Effective date 5/13/2009.