WA HB1305 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Improving access to and provision of a free appropriate public education for students with disabilities.
Title
Improving access to and provision of a free appropriate public education for students with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2023-03-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-24 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-02-09 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-09 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 155 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28a | 155 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 155 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 155 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 155 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 155 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 155 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 155 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 155 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 225 | 330 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |