WA HB1305 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning unlawful entry on certain properties.
Title
Concerning unlawful entry on certain properties.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] | Rep. Melanie Stambaugh [R] |
Rep. Larry Haler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2017-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-16 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:00 PM. |
2017-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB5388 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-10 - Effective date 7/23/2017.