WA HB1305 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying vehicle prowling provisions.
Title
Modifying vehicle prowling provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government. |
2013-02-08 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-07 | House | PS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |