WA HB1298 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing the recommendations of the sunshine committee.
Title
Implementing the recommendations of the sunshine committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 5:30 PM. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2014-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-05 | House | GOE - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | GOE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Government Operations & Elections. |
2014-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2013-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-04 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-02-18 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-14 | House | GOE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-14 | House | GOE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5169 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.