WA HB1293 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the distribution of monetary penalties to local courts and state agencies paid for failure to comply with discover pass requirements.
Title
Concerning the distribution of monetary penalties to local courts and state agencies paid for failure to comply with discover pass requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-04-02 | House | Chapter 268, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2020-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-12 | House | Vote on third reading will be reconsidered. |
2020-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 4; excused, 1. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-23 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5420 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.