WA HB1287 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government and Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government and Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a government-to-government relationship between state government and Indian tribes.
Title
Establishing a government-to-government relationship between state government and Indian tribes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2012-01-12 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. | |
2011-03-03 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | |
2011-02-24 | Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-16 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-16 | SGTA - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-16 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-16 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-02-10 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-18 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1287&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1287.pdf |