WA HB1282 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring environmental and labor reporting for public building construction and renovation material.
Title
Requiring environmental and labor reporting for public building construction and renovation material.
Sponsors
Rep. Davina Duerr [D] | Rep. David Hackney [D] | Rep. Liz Berry [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] |
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Ways & Means (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Ways & Means (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-28 | House | Chapter 344, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-28 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 57; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2024-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2024-02-13 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2024-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2023-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2023-03-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-16 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-16 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-16 | House | CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5322 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
43 | 88 | 0301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |