WA HB1281 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing limited access to motor vehicle records for driver and pedestrian safety in private communities.
Title
Providing limited access to motor vehicle records for driver and pedestrian safety in private communities.
Sponsors
Rep. Frederick Finn [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. James McCune [R] |
Rep. Chris Reykdal [D] | Rep. James Wilcox [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-26 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Transportation. | |
2012-01-12 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-22 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2011-03-01 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2011-02-26 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 71; nays, 26; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-02-26 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-22 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. | |
2011-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-01-27 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-01-27 | TR - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-01-27 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-01-27 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-01-25 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-01-18 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5701 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.