WA HB1280 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding the expiration of explosives licenses issued under chapter 70.74 RCW.
Title
Regarding the expiration of explosives licenses issued under chapter 70.74 RCW.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Armstrong [R] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Rep. Cary Condotta [R] | Rep. Larry Crouse [R] |
Rep. Joel Kretz [R] | Rep. Daniel Kristiansen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-09 | Chapter 39, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-09 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-03 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-03 | President signed. | |
2009-04-01 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-03-31 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-03-31 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-19 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-19 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-17 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-25 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2009-02-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-02-23 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-02-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-30 | CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-01-30 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-01-30 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-23 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-16 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |