WA HB1277 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-31 - Effective date 8/24/2011***.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-31 - Effective date 8/24/2011***.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning oversight of licensed or certified long-term care settings for vulnerable adults.
Title
Concerning oversight of licensed or certified long-term care settings for vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | Effective date 8/24/2011***. | |
2011-05-31 | Chapter 3, 2011 Laws 1st Special Session. | |
2011-05-31 | Governor signed. | |
2011-05-23 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-05-23 | President signed. | |
2011-05-22 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-05-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2011-05-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-05-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-05-06 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-05-05 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-05-05 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-05-05 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-05-03 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-05-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 45; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2011-05-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-05-02 | Floor amendment | |
2011-05-02 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2011-05-02 | Rules suspended. | |
2011-04-29 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-22 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2011-04-08 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-04-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-04-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-06 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-04-05 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-21 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-03-21 | WAYS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-03-21 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-21 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-02-24 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-10 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-10 | HCW - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-10 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-10 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-02-02 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-18 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5092 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.